+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
- Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefore a new draft, see S2126
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Health Care Financing
On October 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2013 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in B-1
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Public Health