+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Accompanied a new draft, see H4419
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday March 7, 2018, pending concurrence
On October 18, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/31/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Labor and Workforce Development