+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On July 5, 2016 in the Senate:
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
- Accompanied by H1714
On November 3, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 11/10/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- House concurred
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Labor and Workforce Development
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor