+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On October 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- New draft substituted, as amended, see S2033
- Read second
On October 15, 2015 in the Senate:
On June 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/26/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- House concurred
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Labor and Workforce Development
+ − Amendment
Amendment #1
An Act relative to fairness in
worker’s compensation disfigurement
benefits