+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- New draft substituted, see S2153
- Read second
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 10, 2016
- Order relative to subject matter adopted
- Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting a new draft, see S2153
On October 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
- Accompanied by H1716
On September 11, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 09/22/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- House concurred
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Labor and Workforce Development
+ − Amendment
Amendment #1
An Act relative to defense against
abusive waivers
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor