+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On June 30, 2020 in the House:
- Accompanied H1346
On May 21, 2020 in the House:
- House concurred
On May 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Friday July 31, 2020, pending concurrence
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- House concurred
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Tuesday May 12, 2020, pending concurrence
On November 5, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on The Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor