+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On July 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Accompanied a new draft, see S2599
On December 4, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred
On November 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
On July 10, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
On June 30, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on The Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor