+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Accompanied a study order, see S2148
On June 20, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Health Care Financing
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2013 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Mental Health and Substance Abuse
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor