+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On September 19, 2016 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H4613
On July 10, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/14/2015 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
- Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD
On July 8, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/14/2015 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- House concurred
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities