+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On July 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommitted to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
- Read second
On July 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed in the Orders of the Day for Saturday, July 30, 2016
- Order relative to subject matter adopted
- Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see S2467
On July 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/16/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in 437
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- House concurred
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities
+ − Amendment
Amendment #1
An Act promoting restorative justice
practices
+ − Sponsors (38)
Type:
Primary Sponsor