+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On June 9, 2022 in the Senate:
On May 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 31, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 1, 2022, pending concurrence
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Health Care Financing
On June 23, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/01/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Financial Services
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor