+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Accompanied a study order, see S2917
On May 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 31, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 1, 2022, pending concurrence
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Health Care Financing
On September 28, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/12/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Financial Services
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor