+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On June 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Accompanied a new draft, see S2777
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Monday May 4, 2020, pending concurrence
On September 13, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Financial Services
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor