+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- New draft substituted, see S2137
- Read second
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 25, 2016
- Order relative to subject matter adopted
- Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see S2137
On December 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On October 5, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/13/2015 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-2
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- House concurred
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Health Care Financing
+ − Amendment
Amendment #1
An Act relative to HIV-Associated
lipodystrophy treatment
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor