+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On July 24, 2014 in the Senate:
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2013 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Housing
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor