+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On September 18, 2014 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H4471
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On June 2, 2014 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 18, 2014, pending concurrence
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday, May 28, 2014, pending concurrence
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/04/2013 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Housing
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor