+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Accompanied a study order, see S2772
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- House concurred
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Saturday December 31, 2022, pending concurrence
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 01/27/2022 from 12:00 PM-01:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
On January 5, 2022 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Discharged to the committee on Public Health
On October 27, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 11/03/2021 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture