+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On June 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Accompanied a study order, see S2356
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Health Care Financing
On December 1, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 12/08/2015 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- House concurred
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Financial Services