+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Accompanied a study order, see S2540
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing rescheduled to 05/14/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture