+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on file
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on file
- Committee recommended ought NOT to pass
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 04/28/2015 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- House concurred
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Election Laws