+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On June 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- New draft substituted, see S2374
- Read second
On June 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed in the Orders of the Day for Wednesday, June 29, 2016
- Order relative to subject matter adopted
- Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see S2374
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On October 21, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/27/2015 from 10:30 AM-02:00 PM in B-2
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- House concurred
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Financial Services
+ − Amendment
Amendment #1
An Act to promote personal savings