+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 80 of the Acts of 2016
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Enacted
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On September 17, 2015 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On September 8, 2015 in the House:
- Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On September 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On July 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee
- Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- House concurred
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Election Laws
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor