+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Accompanied a new draft, see S2394
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Saturday March 10, 2018, pending concurrence
On November 16, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 11/29/2017 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor