+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On April 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
On June 18, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 12:30 PM-04:00 PM in Division of Fisheries and Wildlife
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture