+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 16, 2022 in the House:
- Accompanied a new draft, see H4780
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Monday May 16, 2022, pending concurrence
On September 20, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 09/27/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Elder Affairs