+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On August 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
On November 2, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 11/10/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Division of Fisheries and Wildlife
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- House concurred
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor