+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- New draft substituted as amended, see S2052
On November 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Laid over (under Senate Rule 31) until the next session
- Read second
On November 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed in the Orders of the Day for Wednesday, November 18, 2015
- Order relative to subject matter adopted
- Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see S2052
On July 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On June 18, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/23/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- House concurred
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture
+ − Amendment
Amendment #1
An Act establishing the Massachusetts
paint stewardship program