+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On July 24, 2014 in the Senate:
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On June 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2013 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor