+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On May 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Accompanied a new draft, see S2883
On May 16, 2022 in the House:
- House concurred
On May 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Monday May 23, 2022, pending concurrence
- Amendment (changing reporting date to Monday May 23, 2022) adopted, pending concurrence
On April 27, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Sunday May 15, 2022, pending concurrence
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Sunday May 1, 2022, pending concurrence
On November 16, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 11/23/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Education
+ − Sponsors (50)
Type:
Primary Sponsor