+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On June 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Accompanied a new draft, see S2557
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On May 14, 2018 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 13, 2018, pending concurrence
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Amendment (changing reporting date to Wednesday May 9, 2018) adopted, pending concurrence
- Reporting date extended to Friday June 15, 2018, pending concurrence
On August 23, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 09/11/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Elder Affairs