+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Health Care Financing
- Accompanied by H2886
On August 23, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 09/11/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Elder Affairs