+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (25)
On December 22, 2020 in the House:
- Order adopted, see H5213
- Referred to the committee on Bills in the Third Reading
On December 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor's amendment adopted, as amended -see Roll Call #312 (Yeas 31 to Nays 9)
- Amendment #7 (Tarr) rejected
- Amendment #6 (Tarr) rejected
- Amendment #5 (Tarr) rejected
- Amendment #4 (Tarr) rejected -see Roll Call #311 (Yeas 12 to Nays 28)
- Amendment #2 (DiZoglio) rejected
- Amendment #1 (DiZoglio) rejected -see Roll Call #310 (Yeas 12 to Nays 28)
- Bill in the Third Reading report accepted
- Rules suspended
On December 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Senate Bills in the Third Reading
On December 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor returned to Senate with amendment, see S2975
On December 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On December 1, 2020 in the House:
- Enacted - 91 YEAS to 67 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 285)
On December 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Emergency preamble adopted -see Roll Call #301 (Yeas 28 to Nays 11)
On December 1, 2020 in the House:
- Emergency preamble adopted - 123 YEAS to 36 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 284)
- Committee of conference report accepted - 92 YEAS to 67 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 283)
- Rules suspended
- Referred to the committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, question being on acceptance
On December 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee of conference report accepted -see Roll Call #300 (Yeas 28 to Nays 12)
- Rules suspended
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported on S2820
- Reported from the committee of conference
+ − Sponsor
Senate Committee on Ways and Means
Type:
Primary Sponsor