+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On November 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 212 of the Acts of 2020
On November 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On November 19, 2020 in the House:
- Enacted
On November 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Emergency preamble adopted
On November 12, 2020 in the House:
- Emergency preamble adopted
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On November 2, 2020 in the House:
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
- Rules suspended
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On October 29, 2020 in the House:
- Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On October 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On October 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Bill reported favorably by committee
- New draft of S2923
- Reported from the committee on Public Service
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor