+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On August 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Accompanied a study order, see S2899
On August 5, 2020 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 08/10/2020 from 12:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
On July 13, 2020 in the House:
- House concurred
On July 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Education
- Rules suspended
On June 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor