+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Accompanied a study order, see S2839
On April 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 4, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday April 15, 2022, pending concurrence
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 03/23/2022 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- House concurred
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies
- Rules suspended
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently