+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On January 1, 2019 in the House:
- No further action taken
On December 24, 2018 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On December 20, 2018 in the House:
- Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On December 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third, amendment (as recommended by the committee on Senate Bills in the Third Reading) and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On December 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
- Bill reported favorably by committee
On November 21, 2018 in the House:
- House concurred
On September 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Public Service
- Rules suspended
On September 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently