+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On December 29, 2020 in the House:
- Enacted - 157 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 407)
On December 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended
- Senate concurred in the House amendment
On October 19, 2020 in the House:
- Read third, amended by substitution of a new text (H5060) and passed to be engrossed
On July 31, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendments pending
On July 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On July 31, 2020 in the House:
- Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
- Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text contained in House document numbered 4931
On July 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On July 31, 2020 in the House:
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading, with the amendment pending
- Rules suspended
- Read second
- Amendment (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) adopted
- Ordered to a third reading
On July 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Bill reported favorably by committee
On June 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2020 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On June 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 30, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday July 31, 2020, pending concurrence
On April 6, 2020 in the House:
- House concurred
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight
- Rules suspended
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor