+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On July 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Accompanied a study order, see S3063
On July 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On July 25, 2022 in the House:
- Amendment (changing reporting date to Friday July 29, 2022) adopted, pending concurrence
On July 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Friday July 22, 2022, pending concurrence
On June 30, 2022 in the House:
- House concurred
On June 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday June 30, 2022, pending concurrence
On April 14, 2022 in the House:
- House concurred
On April 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Friday April 15, 2022, pending concurrence
On January 18, 2022 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 01/25/2022 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On December 23, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred
On June 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended
- Referred to the committee on The Judiciary
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently