+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On August 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported by S3097
On June 23, 2022 in the House:
- House insisted on its amendment
- Committee of conference appointed, in concurrence (Madaro-Garlick-Kane)
On June 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended
- Senate NON-concurred in the House amendment
- Committee on conference (Cyr-Friedman-Tarr), appointed
On June 16, 2022 in the House:
- Rules suspended
- Read third
- For text of amendment, see H4891
- Passed to be engrossed - 155 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 201 )
On June 15, 2022 in the House:
- Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting with the amendment (H4879) pending
- Rules suspended
- Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) and ordered to a third reading
On November 24, 2021 in the House:
- Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
On November 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text of S2572, printed as amended
- Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #114 (Yeas 39 – Nays 0)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Senate Committee on Ways and Means
Type:
Primary Sponsor