+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Accompanied H4441
On December 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On November 15, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 11/19/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2
- House concurred
On October 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs
- Rules suspended
On September 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor