+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On August 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 215 of the Acts of 2018
On July 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Laid before the Governor
- Enacted - Roll Call #544 [YEAS 36 to NAYS 0]
On July 31, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted - 151 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 494)
On July 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in the House amendment
- Rules suspended
On July 30, 2018 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
- Rules suspended
- Read second, amended by substitution of a new text (H4842) and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting with the amendment (H4842) pending
- Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On July 26, 2018 in the House:
- Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
On July 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On July 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee recommended ought to pass
On July 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On July 10, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2018 from 01:00 PM-02:00 PM in B-1
On June 28, 2018 in the House:
- House concurred
On June 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight
- Rules suspended
On June 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently