+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On December 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 98 of the Acts of 2021
On November 24, 2021 in the House:
- Enacted
On November 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Emergency preamble adopted
On November 24, 2021 in the House:
- Emergency preamble adopted
On November 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On November 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended
- Senate concurred in the House amendment
On November 16, 2021 in the House:
- Read third
- Passed to be engrossed - 157 YEAS to 2 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 116 )
On November 15, 2021 in the House:
- Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting with the amendment (H4249) pending
- Rules suspended
- Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means)
- Ordered to a third reading
On October 21, 2021 in the House:
- Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
On October 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Substituted for S2525
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read third
- Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #97 (Yeas 39 – Nays 0)
On October 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means
- Recommended new draft for S2525
+ − Sponsors (112)
Joint Committee on Education
Type:
Primary Sponsor