+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On June 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported by S2924
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- House insisted on its amendment
- Committee of conference appointed, in concurrence - (M. Moran-Ryan-Dooley)
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended
- Senate NON-concurred in the House amendment
- Committee of conference (Finegold-Creem-Fattman), appointed
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Read third
- Passed to be engrossed - 124 YEAS to 34 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 140 )
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting with the amendment (H4359) pending
- Rules suspended
- Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means)
- Ordered to a third reading
On October 14, 2021 in the House:
- Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
On October 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text of S2545, printed as amended
- Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #95 (Yeas 36 to Nays 3)
+ − Sponsors (40)
Senate Committee on Ways and Means
Type:
Primary Sponsor