+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On September 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 246 of the Acts of 2018
On September 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On September 13, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted
On September 10, 2018 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On July 18, 2018 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On July 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On July 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On June 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
- Bill substituted for report
- Rules suspended
- Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10)
On May 25, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/30/2018 from 10:30 AM-11:30 AM in A-2
On May 7, 2018 in the House:
- House concurred
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure