+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On October 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 284 of the Acts of 2016
On September 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On September 29, 2016 in the House:
- Enacted
On September 26, 2016 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On September 22, 2016 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On September 19, 2016 in the House:
- Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On September 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On August 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On August 3, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD
On July 28, 2016 in the House:
- House concurred
On July 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Municipalities and Regional Government
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor