+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On January 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enacted
On January 6, 2021 in the House:
- Enacted
On January 5, 2021 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
- Rules suspended
On January 4, 2021 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
On November 16, 2020 in the House:
- Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On November 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
- Rules suspended
On December 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
- New draft of S1268
- Reported from the committee on Public Health
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor