+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On June 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
On May 26, 2022 in the House:
- House concurred
On May 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Friday June 3, 2022, pending concurrence
On April 21, 2022 in the House:
- House concurred
On April 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Saturday April 30, 2022, pending concurrence
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- House concurred
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Amendment (changing reporting date to Friday April 8, 2022) adopted, pending concurrence
- Reporting date extended to Friday April 8, 2022, pending concurrence
On August 31, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 09/07/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
- Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD
- Hearing scheduled for 09/07/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor