+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 6, 2015 in the Senate:
On December 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On November 24, 2014 in the House:
- House concurred
On November 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Municipalities and Regional Government
- Rules suspended
On November 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor