+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On November 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported by S2412
On October 28, 2019 in the House:
- House insisted on its amendment
On October 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee on conference appointed (Lewis-Rodrigues-O'Connor)
- Senate NON-concurred in the House amendments
- Rules suspended
On October 28, 2019 in the House:
- Committee on conference appointed, in concurrence - (Peisch-Tucker-Ferguson)
On October 23, 2019 in the House:
- Passed to be engrossed - 155 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 121)
- For actions, see H4137
- Read third
- Rules suspended
On October 21, 2019 in the House:
- Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text contained in House document numbered H4137
- Order adopted, see H4135
- Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on Ways and Means) and ordered to a third reading
- Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading, with the amendment pending
- Rules suspended
On October 7, 2019 in the House:
- Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
- Read; and referred to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
On October 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed to be engrossed - see Roll Call #107 [39 YEAS - 0 NAYS]
- Text of S2350, printed as amended