+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On April 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 59 of the Acts of 2020
On April 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Re-enacted and again laid before the Governor
On April 9, 2020 in the House:
- Re-enacted
- House concurred in the Senate amendment
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Bills in the Third Reading
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor's amendment adopted
- Report accepted
- Rules suspended
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Bills in the Third Reading
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor returned to Senate with amendment, see S2542
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Enacted
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On November 7, 2019 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On October 28, 2019 in the House:
- Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On October 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
- Rules suspended
- Read second, amended and ordered to a third reading
On October 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
- New draft of S2293
- Reported from the committee on Public Service